Search Here

Math Shortcuts Tricks

Multiply Math Shortcuts Tricks

Multiply Two Digit Numbers – Math Shortcuts Tricks

  • I assume we all know one digit multiplication table from 1 to 9, like 5 × 9.  Now i am going show you how to multiplying two digit numbers.

  • Now we will subtract 100 from each numbers so here it will look like 100 – 94 and 100 – 95. The Result will be look like as following

  • Now we subtract diagonally for one time. So in this case it would be 94 – 5 OR 95 – 6. Here we take 94 – 5= 89.  Now we got the first part of our answers = 89.



  • Now the last step is simple we will multiply both number written in circle so here it would be 6 × 5 = 30. Now we go second part of our answer = 30.

Final Answer

The easier the method you use, the faster you do the problem and the less likely you are to make a mistake. Now, here are some more problems to do by yourself.

55 × 65 = ?74 × 85 = ?72 × 98 = ?
77 × 53 = ?35 × 44 = ?47 × 56 = ?
45 × 78 = ?16 × 74 = ?85 × 66 = ?
{{ reviewsOverall }} / 5 Users (0 votes)
Rating
What people asked Leave your query
Order by:

Be the first to leave a review.

User AvatarUser Avatar
Verified
{{{review.rating_comment | nl2br}}}

Show more
{{ pageNumber+1 }}
Leave your query